+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-1030s, AA, VV; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1030s, MA, VV; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
- Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
- Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1030s, 03/23/2023; SC 14
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0593s, AA, VV; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0593s, RC 24Y-0N, MA; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0593s, 02/22/2023; SC 11
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/08/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:45 am; SC 9
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 5
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Vote
February 22, 2023: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Regina Birdsell: Yea
- Shannon Chandley: Yea
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Yea
- Donovan Fenton: Yea
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Yea
- Suzanne Prentiss: Yea
- Rebecca Whitley: Yea
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Yea
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor