+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2023; Chapter 0074; Effective 06/07/2023
On May 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/18/2023); SJ 16
On May 31, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 04/18/2023
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 15
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 03/29/2023 (Vote 14-0; CC)
- Executive Session: 03/29/2023 09:30 am LOB 201-203
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/29/2023 09:30 am LOB 201-203
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 101, LOB, 01:30 pm; SC 8
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 5