+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Pending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 01/08/2020; SJ 1
- Sen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, RC 13Y-11N, MA; 01/08/2020; SJ 1
On October 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/08/2020; SC 47
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 03/14/2019; SJ 8
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/14/2019; SC 13
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, SH, 01:15 pm; SC 10
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Finance; SJ 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor