+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (18)
On August 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 08/04/2023; Chapter 0218; Effective 06/30/2024
On July 19, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 18
On July 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/15/2023; SJ 19
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-1899h: AA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 16
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1899h: MA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 16
On May 19, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1899h 05/17/2023 (Vote 9-0; CC)
On May 11, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/17/2023 10:15 am LOB 104
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/17/2023 10:00 am LOB 104
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 05/10/2023 10:30 am LOB 104
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/10/2023 11:15 am LOB 104
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Special Committee on Childcare
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Murphy Moved to Remove SB 170 from the Consent Calendar; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0843s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0843s, AA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0843s, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 8
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 5
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor