+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On March 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-1029s, AA, VV; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1029s, MA, VV; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
- Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
- Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1029s, 03/23/2023; SC 14
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/07/2023, Room 103, SH, 01:10 pm; SC 9
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Finance; SJ 5