+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA DV 187-186 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 44
On April 25, 2023 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate SB167-FN-LOCAL 04/18/2023 (Vote 11-9; RC)
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/18/2023 09:00 am LOB 302-304
- Full Committee Work Session: 04/17/2023 01:00 pm LOB 302-304
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/10/2023 10:30 am LOB 302-304
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2023; SC 11
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0407s, AA, VV; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0407s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0407s, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9A
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/02/2023, Room 103, SH, 01:30 pm; SC 8
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 5