+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 01/03/2024; SJ 1
On December 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; CC; 01/03/2024; SC 49
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Avard Moved to Remove SB165 from the Consent Calendar; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Committee Amendment # 2023-1138s, AF, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Ought to Pass: MF, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Avard Moved to Rerefer to Committee, MA, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1138s, 03/30/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 15
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- ==RECONVENE== Hearing: 02/21/2023, Room 103, SH, 09:00 am; SC 11
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- ==RECESSED== Hearing: 02/15/2023, Room 103, SH, 01:30 pm; SC 10
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 5