+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Lay SB164 on Table (Rep. Vail): MA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 14
On May 9, 2023 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 05/03/2023 (Vote 16-4; RC)
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
On April 26, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/03/2023 10:30 am LOB 305-307
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/19/2023 01:00 pm LOB 305-307
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0554s, AA, VV; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0554s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0554s, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 103, SH, 09:45 am; SC 8
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 5