+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 01/03/2024; SJ 1
On December 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 49
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/14/2023, Room 103, SH, 09:15 am; SC 10
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 5
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor