+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On February 15, 2018 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 02/15/2018 HJ 4 P. 24
- Ought to Pass: MF DV 97-227 02/15/2018 HJ 4 P. 24
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Special Order to 2/15/2018 Without Objection HJ 3 P. 81
On January 9, 2018 in the House:
- Special Order to next session day Without Objection HJ 2 P. 47
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Special Order to 1/9/2018 Without Objection HJ 1 P. 104
On October 26, 2017 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/03/2018 (Vote 11-3; RC)
On October 11, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/18/2017 10:00 AM LOB 203
On September 14, 2017 in the House:
- Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/27/2017 09:00 AM LOB 203
On August 24, 2017 in the House:
- Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/14/2017 01:00 PM LOB 203
On August 17, 2017 in the House:
- Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 08/24/2017 10:00 AM LOB 203
On May 9, 2017 in the House:
- Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 05/17/2017 10:00 AM LOB 203
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On April 18, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/26/2017 10:00 AM LOB 203
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/12/2017 10:30 AM LOB 203
- Introduced 03/23/2017 and referred to Transportation HJ 11 P. 27
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/29/2017; SJ 11
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/29/2017; SC 16
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/21/2017, Room 101, LOB, 01:15 pm; SC 15
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor