+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 8, 2019 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 8
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 05/08/2019 (Vote 15-2; CC) HC 23 P. 5
On April 16, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/23/2019 10:00 am LOB 307
On April 2, 2019 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 04/16/2019 11:30 am LOB 307
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 04/09/2019 11:30 am LOB 307
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources HJ 11 P. 70
On March 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0654s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment # 2019-0654s, AA, VV; 03/07/2019; SJ 7
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0654s, 03/07/2019; SC 12
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 103, SH, 09:15 am; SC 10
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 4