+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- II. Remainder Effective 06/08/2017
- I. Section 2 Effective 11/01/2018
- Signed by the Governor on 06/08/2017; Chapter 0106
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/18/2017); SJ 18
On May 24, 2017 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/18/2017 HJ 16 P. 9
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Sen. Sanborn Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/11/2017; SJ 16
On May 4, 2017 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 1427h: MA VV 05/04/2017 HJ 15 P. 2
- Amendment #2017-1427h: AA VV 05/04/2017 HJ 15 P. 2
On April 20, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-1427h for 05/04/2017 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 22 P. 4
On April 11, 2017 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/18/2017 02:00 PM LOB 302
- Subcommittee Work Session: 04/18/2017 10:00 AM LOB 302
On April 4, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/11/2017 10:00 AM LOB 307
On March 27, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs 03/23/2017 HJ 11 P. 7
On March 23, 2017 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 03/23/2017 HJ 11 P. 7
On March 15, 2017 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/23/2017 (Vote 13-0; CC) HC 16 P. 4
- Executive Session: 03/15/2017 LOB 202
On March 8, 2017 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/15/2017 10:30 AM LOB 202
On March 7, 2017 in the House:
- Introduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Ways and Means HJ 8 P. 44
On January 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/19/2017; SJ 4
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/19/2017; SC 6
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/11/2017, Room 100, SH, 09:00 am; SC 5
On January 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- To Be Introduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 4