+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2023; Chapter 0100; Effective 06/20/2023
On June 13, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/08/2023 HJ 15
On June 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/08/2023); SJ 19
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 3
On May 11, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/09/2023 (Vote 19-0; CC)
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/09/2023 01:00 pm LOB 301-303
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/09/2023 09:30 am LOB 301-303
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/25/2023 10:15 am LOB 301-303
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Environment and Agriculture
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0837s, AA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0837s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0837s, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/15/2023, Room 103, SH, 01:15 pm; SC 10
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 5