+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On June 27, 2023 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; HJ 16
On June 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 06/20/2023, 11:00 a.m., Room 103, SH
On June 15, 2023 in the House:
- House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Rep. Berry): MA VV 06/15/2023 HJ 16
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Berry, Lane, Muirhead, Boehm 06/15/2023 HJ 16
On June 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Gray, Birdsell, Soucy; (In Recess 06/08/2023); SJ 19
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Gray Moved Nonconcur with the House Amendment; Requests C of C, MA, VV; 06/01/2023; SJ 16
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-1385h: AA VV 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 7
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1385h: MA VV 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 7
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1385h 04/18/2023 (Vote 18-0; CC)
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/18/2023 10:15 am LOB 306-308
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/11/2023 01:30 pm LOB 306-308
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Election Law
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2023; SC 11
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0248s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0248s, AA, VV; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0248s, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 8
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 5