+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 23, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/18/2023 10:15 am LOB 306-308
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/11/2023 01:00 pm LOB 306-308
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Election Law
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0253s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0253s, AA, VV; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0253s, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:15 am; SC 8
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 5
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor