+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (52)
On June 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- II. Remainder Effective 08/20/2016
- I. Sections 4-6 Effective 07/01/2023
- Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2016; Chapter 0293
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); SJ 20
On June 15, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/01/2016 HJ 42 P. 66
On June 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2144e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 06/01/2016); SJ 20
On June 9, 2016 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2144e: AA VV 06/01/2016 HJ 42 P. 62
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 1999c, Adopted, VV; 06/01/2016 SJ 19
On June 1, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 1999c: Adopted, VV 06/01/2016 HJ 42 P. 10
On May 24, 2016 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report #2016-1999c Filed 05/24/2016; As Amended by the House
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Conferee Change; Senator Carson Replaces Senator Woodburn SJ 19
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- ==RECONVENE== Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/23/2016, 08:30 am, Room 103, SH
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 05/19/2016, 02:30 pm, Room 103, SH==RECESSED==
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps. Hunt, Gidge, Hurt, Weyler 05/11/2015 HJ 38 P. 5
- House Accedes to Senate Request for CofC (Reps. Hunt, Kurk): MA VV 05/11/2016 HJ 38 P. 5
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Reagan, Woodburn, Avard; (In Recess 04/14/2016); SJ 14
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment # 0440h; Requests C of C, MA, VV; 03/31/2016; SJ 11
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0440h: MA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 30
- Amendment #2016-0440h: AA VV 03/09/2016 HJ 23 P. 30
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-0440h (NT) for 03/09/2016 (Vote 23-2; CC) HC 14 P. 19
On February 19, 2016 in the House:
- ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 03/02/2016 01:00 PM LOB 210-211
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/03/2016 09:00 AM LOB 210
On February 8, 2016 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Division I Work Session: 02/16/2016 10:00 AM LOB 212
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 02/08/2016 10:00 AM LOB 212
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Division I Work Session: 02/02/2016 10:45 AM LOB 212
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Amendment #2015-2504h: AA VV 01/06/2016 HJ 4 P. 72
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2504h: MA VV 01/06/2016 HJ 4 P. 72
- Referred to Finance 01/06/2016 HJ 4 P. 75
On November 12, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2504h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 16-3; RC); HC 67, PG. 14-15
On October 14, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 10/27/2015 1:15 PM LOB 302
On October 13, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2015 11:00 AM LOB 302
On September 29, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/13/2015 11:00 AM LOB 302
On September 15, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/29/2015 11:00 AM LOB 302
On September 1, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/15/2015 11:00 AM LOB 302
On August 24, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/1/2015 11:00 AM LOB 302
On June 12, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/23/2015 10:00 AM LOB 302
On June 2, 2015 in the House:
- Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/9/2015 1:15 PM LOB 302
- Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/9/2015 1:15 PM LOB 302
- Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 6/9/2015 1:15 PM LOB 302
On April 28, 2015 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- ===CANCELLED=== Work Session: 4/21/2015 11:00 AM LOB 302
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 4/28/2015 10:00 AM LOB 302
- Subcommittee Work Session: 4/21/2015 11:00 AM LOB 302
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 3/31/2015 11:00 AM LOB 302
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs (in recess of 3/12/2015); HJ 26, PG. 1276
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0805s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 9
- Committee Amendment 0805s, AA, VV
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0805s, 3/19/15; SC13
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; SJ 7
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/5/15; SC11
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/18/15, Room 101, LOB, 9:00 a.m.; SC10
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 4