+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Lay SB155 on Table (Rep. Wilhelm): MA DV 252-120 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 30
On April 26, 2023 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate SB155-FN-LOCAL 04/11/2023 (Vote 15-5; RC)
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/11/2023 11:00 am LOB 205-207
On March 23, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 03/30/2023 11:30 am LOB 205-207
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Education
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0809s, AA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0809s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0809s, 03/16/2023; SC 13
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/07/2023, Room 103, LOB, 10:00 am; SC 8
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 5