+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===
On January 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/30/14; Vote 5-0; CC; SC4
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV;
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/28/13; Vote 5-0; SC13
On February 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/20/13, Room 101, LOB, 9:45 a.m.; SC9
On January 31, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources; SJ 5