+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Gray Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Pending Motion OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2023; SC 15
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Watters Moved to Remove SB 153 from the Consent Calendar; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Rereferred to Committee, MF, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Sen. Watters Floor Amendment # 2023-0988s, AA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0988s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
- Sen. Watters Moved Ought to Pass; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On January 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/07/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 9
On January 20, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Education; SJ 5
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor