+ − Actions (10)
On September 23, 2020 in the House:
- Died on Table
On June 30, 2020 in the House:
- Vacated and Laid on Table MA VV 06/30/2020 HJ 10 P. 4
On February 3, 2020 in the House:
- Introduced 01/09/2020 and referred to Municipal and County Government HJ 2 P. 59
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2888s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/08/2020; SJ 1
- Committee Amendment # 2019-2888s, AA, VV; 01/08/2020; SJ 1
On December 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2888s, 01/08/2020; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 47
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 03/27/2019; SJ 10
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 15
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/13/2019, Room 102, LOB, 10:00 am; SC 12
On January 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 4
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor