+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 4, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/03/2024 HJ 1 P. 113
- Ought to Pass: MF RC 183-186 01/03/2024 HJ 1 P. 111
- Reconsider SB151 (Rep. Sweeney): MF RC 183-187 01/03/2024 HJ 1 P. 113
On November 17, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Without Recommendation 11/13/2023 (Vote 10-10; RC) HC 49 P. 31
On October 10, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/13/2023 09:30 am LOB 205-207
On September 20, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 10/12/2023 01:00 pm LOB 205-207 HC 38
On August 24, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/19/2023 10:00 am LOB 205-207
On June 19, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 06/28/2023 10:00 am LOB 205-207
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/30/2023 01:00 pm LOB 205-207
On April 12, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/11/2023 10:30 am LOB 205-207
- Executive Session: 04/11/2023 11:00 am LOB 205-207
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/23/2023 and referred to Education
On March 23, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/23/2023; SJ 11
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/23/2023; SC 14
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0636s, AA, VV; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0636s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0636s, 03/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 12
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:30 am; SC 8
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Education; SJ 5
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor