+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; SJ 7
On March 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/14/13; SC11
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: === RECONVENE === 2/19/13, Room 100, SH, 1:00 p.m.; SC8
- Hearing: === RECESSED === 2/5/13, Room 101, LOB, 1:50 p.m.
On January 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/5/13, Room 101, LOB, 1:50 p.m.; SC7
On January 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce; SJ 4
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor