+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2023; Chapter 0073; Effective 06/07/2023
On May 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/18/2023); SJ 16
On May 31, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 04/18/2023
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 12
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/05/2023 (Vote 16-0; CC)
- Executive Session: 04/05/2023 10:30 am LOB 306-308
On March 28, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/05/2023 10:30 am LOB 306-308
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0570s, AA, VV; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0570s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0570s, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On February 2, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/08/2023, Room 103, SH, 10:00 am; SC 9
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 5