+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 01/14/2016; SJ 2
On January 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/14/2016; Vote 5-0; CC; SC1A
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV, SJ 6
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 2/19/15; SC10
On February 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/10/15, Room 100, SH, 11:00 a.m.; SC9
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 5