+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, MA, VV === BILL KILLED ===; 01/14/2016; SJ 2
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/14/2016; SC1
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV, SJ 10
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/26/15; SC14
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; SJ 8
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/12/15; SC12
On February 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/18/15, Room 101, LOB, 10:00 a.m.; SC10
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 5