+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (20)
On October 23, 2024 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 10/14/2024; Chapter 381; Effective 07/01/2024
On October 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Enrolled, Without Objection, MA; 10/10/2024; SJ 18
On October 10, 2024 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2357e: AA VV 10/10/2024 HJ 17 P. 3
- Enrolled 10/10/2024 HJ 17 P. 14
On October 10, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Moved Adoption of Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2357e, AA, VV; 10/10/2024; SJ 18
On May 30, 2024 in the Senate:
- Sen. Gannon Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 05/30/2024; SJ 16
On May 23, 2024 in the House:
- Amendment # 2024-1888h: AA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 2
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-1888h: MA VV 05/23/2024 HJ 14 P. 2
On May 15, 2024 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-1888 05/15/2024 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 20 P. 5
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/15/2024 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On May 1, 2024 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/08/2024 01:15 pm LOB 302-304
On April 9, 2024 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/30/2024 01:45 pm LOB 302-304
On February 29, 2024 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs HJ 6 P. 137
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2024-0008s, AA, VV; 01/03/2024; SJ 1
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0008s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/03/2024; SJ 1
On December 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0008s, 01/03/2024, Vote 4-0; SC 49
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 100, SH, 10:15 am; SC 8
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 5