+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0801s, AF, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Ought to Pass: MF, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Gray Moved to Rerefer to Committee, MA, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Special Order to 03/30/2023, Without Objection, MA; 03/16/2023 SJ 10
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0801s, 03/30/2023; SC 15
On March 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0801s, 03/16/2023; SC 13
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 103, LOB, 09:45 am; SC 8
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; SJ 5