+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/06/2015; Chapter 0209; Effective 09/04/2015
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); SJ 19
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled; HJ 54, PG. 2102
On June 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2158e Adopted, VV, (In recess of 6/11/2015); SJ 19
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2015-2158-EBA: AA VV (in recess of 6/11/2015); HJ 46, PG. 1991
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ 44, PG. 1832
On May 21, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jun 3 (Vote 15-0; CC); HC 39, PG. 1631
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 5/20/2015 10:00 AM LOB 201
On March 31, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 4/8/2015 10:15 AM LOB 201
On March 24, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Public Works and Highways (in recess of 3/12/2015); HJ 26, PG. 1276
On March 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 9
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/19/15; SC13
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; SJ 7
On February 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/5/15; SC11
On February 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/17/15, Room 103, LOB, 1:15 p.m.; SC10
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Transportation; SJ 5
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor