+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 3, 2024 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 01/03/2024; SJ 1
On December 18, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2024; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 49
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 13
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/15/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 10
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 5
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor