+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0096; Effective 08/19/2013
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled 5/2/13
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; HJ41, PG.1424
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ41, PG.1392
On May 1, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 19-1; CC); HC36, PG.1199
On April 17, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 4/24/2013 1:00 PM LOB 305 ==Or One Hour Following House Session==
On April 3, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 10:45 AM LOB 305
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; HJ31, PG.1075
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0780s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment 0780s, AA, VV; SJ 7
On March 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0780s, 3/14/13; SC11
On February 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/13/13, Room 101, LOB, 10:00 a.m.; SC8
On January 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources; SJ 4
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor