+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On October 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 1/6/16; SC49
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV, SJ 8
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; SC12
On January 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 1/20/15, Room 100, SH, 1:45 p.m.; SC6
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Commerce; SJ 4