+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On January 3, 2024 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 01/03/2024 HJ 1 P. 56
On November 15, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate SB128-FN 11/16/2023 (Vote 25-0; CC) HC 49 P. 14
On October 17, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/14/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211 HC 42
On September 26, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 11/08/2023 11:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
On September 22, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/15/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
- ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 11/08/2023 10:00 am LOB 206-208 HC 39
On September 12, 2023 in the House:
- Division Work Session: 09/21/2023 10:00 am LOB 212 HC 37
On June 1, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On May 31, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 06/01/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211
On May 22, 2023 in the House:
- Division Work Session: 05/31/2023 01:00 pm LOB 212
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-1676h: AF DV 182-201 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 10
- Ought to Pass: MA RC 207-177 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 10
- Referred to Finance 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 10
On May 10, 2023 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1676h 05/10/2023 (Vote 17-3; RC)
- Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/10/2023 09:30 am LOB 206-208
On May 2, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2023-1482h: 05/10/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On May 1, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 05/03/2023 09:00 am LOB 206-208
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 01:00 pm LOB 206-208
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Judiciary
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2023; SC 11
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0423s, AA, VV; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0423s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On February 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0423s, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9A
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 100, SH, 01:00 pm; SC 8
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 5