+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (17)
On July 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- II. Remainder Effective 07/12/2019
- I. Section 2 Effective 01/01/2020
- Signed by the Governor on 07/12/2019; Chapter 235
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/27/2019 HJ 20 P. 53
On June 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); SJ 21
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Sen. Hennessey Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/13/2019; SJ 20
On May 23, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1608h (NT): MA VV 05/23/2019 HJ 16 P. 16
- Amendment # 2019-1608h (NT): AA VV 05/23/2019 HJ 16 P. 16
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1608h (NT) for 05/23/2019 (Vote 18-0; CC) HC 25 P. 6
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/14/2019 10:00 am LOB 208
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing on Amendment # 2019-1561h: 04/23/2019 10:00 am LOB 208
On March 26, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/17/2019 10:00 am LOB 208
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Judiciary HJ 11 P. 69
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/21/2019; SJ 6
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/21/2019; Vote 5-0; CC SC 11
On February 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/12/2019, Room 100, SH, 09:00 am; SC 10
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 4