+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (22)
On July 11, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/30/2023; Chapter 0145
- I. Sections 1, 2, 5, 6, 11, & 12 Effective 07/01/2023
- II. Sections 3, 4, 8, & 9 Effective 08/29/2023
- III. Remainder Effective 06/30/2023
On June 21, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/15/2023 HJ 16 P. 15
On June 21, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/15/2023); SJ 20
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Birdsell Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/01/2023; SJ 16
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-1457h: AA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 39
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1457h: MA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 40
On May 12, 2023 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1457h 05/03/2023 (Vote 15-5; RC)
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
On April 26, 2023 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/03/2023 09:30 am LOB 201-203
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/26/2023 09:30 am LOB 205-207
On March 29, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 09:30 am LOB 205-207
On March 21, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs
On March 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/16/2023; SJ 10
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/16/2023; SC 13
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0574s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0574s, AA, VV; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0574s, 02/22/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 11
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/08/2023, Room 101, LOB, 09:00 am; SC 9
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 5
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor