+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On June 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/21/2019; Chapter 0120; Effective 08/20/2019
On May 16, 2019 in the House:
- Enrolled 05/08/2019 HJ 15 P. 101
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); SJ 17
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/02/2019 HJ 14 P. 3
On April 23, 2019 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 19-0; CC) HC 22 P. 4
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/18/2019 01:00 pm LOB 204
- Public Hearing: 04/17/2019 01:00 pm LOB 204
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety HJ 11 P. 72
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0978s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/21/2019; SJ 9
- Committee Amendment # 2019-0978s, AA, VV; 03/21/2019; SJ 9
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0978s, 03/21/2019; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 14
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 03/12/2019, Room 100, SH, 09:20 am; SC 13
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 4