+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2023; Chapter 0070; Effective 06/07/2023
On May 31, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 05/18/2023); SJ 16
On May 31, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 04/18/2023
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA VV 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 15
On April 20, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass 04/12/2023 (Vote 17-0; CC)
- Executive Session: 04/12/2023 10:30 am LOB 305-307
On April 4, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 10:30 am LOB 305-307
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development
On March 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0635s, AA, VV; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0635s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 03/09/2023; SJ 9
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0635s, 03/09/2023; SC 12
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On February 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2023; SC 9
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2023, Room 103, SH, 09:15 am; SC 8
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2023 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 5
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor