+ − Actions (6)
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services HJ 4 P. 50
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0621s, RC 23Y-1N, MA; OT3rdg; 03/11/2021; SJ 7
- Committee Amendment # 2021-0621s, RC 23Y-1N, AA; 03/11/2021; SJ 7
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0621s, 03/11/2021; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 14
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Remote Hearing: 02/10/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; SC 10
On January 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 3