+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor 07/17/2020
On July 10, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled 06/30/2020 HJ 10
On July 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); SJ 9
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Sen. Fuller Clark Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, RC 14Y-10N, MA; 06/29/2020; SJ 9
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-1728h: MA RC 212-140 01/09/2020 HJ 2 P. 39
- Amendment # 2019-1728h: AA VV 01/09/2020 HJ 2 P. 39
On November 14, 2019 in the House:
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1728h (Vote 11-8; RC) HC 50 P. 29
On October 21, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 11/06/2019 01:00 pm LOB 304
On July 2, 2019 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 09/10/2019 10:00 am LOB 304
On June 10, 2019 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 06/10/2019 11:00 am LOB 304
On April 30, 2019 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- Executive Session: 04/30/2019 10:00 am LOB 304
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/10/2019 11:00 am LOB 304
On March 21, 2019 in the House:
- Introduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy HJ 11 P. 69
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0829s, RC 14Y-10N, MA; OT3rdg; 03/14/2019; SJ 8
- Sen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2019-0863s, RC 10Y-14N, AF; 03/14/2019; SJ 8
- Committee Amendment # 2019-0829s, AA, VV; 03/14/2019; SJ 8
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0829s, 03/14/2019; SC 13
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/19/2019, Room 103, SH, 10:00 am; SC 11
On January 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
January 9, 2020: OTPA
- Yeas: 212
- Nays: 140
- Present/NV: 9
- Absent: 35
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Nay
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Nay
- John Reagan: Nay
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Martha Fuller Clark: Yea
- Chuck Morse: Nay
- Regina Birdsell: Nay
- Shannon Chandley: Yea
- James Gray: Nay
- Melanie Levesque: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Dan Feltes: Yea
- Harold French: Nay
- Martha Hennessey: Yea
- Bob Giuda: Nay
- Ruth Ward: Nay
- Jay Kahn: Yea
- Kevin Cavanaugh: Yea
- David Starr: Nay
- Jeanne Dietsch: Yea
- Jon Morgan: Yea
- Tom Sherman: Yea
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor