+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (25)
On July 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/13/2015; Chapter 0248; Effective 07/01/2015 at 12:01 a.m.
On July 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled (In recess 6/24/2015); SJ 19
On July 2, 2015 in the House:
- Enrolled (In recess of 6/24/2015); HJ 54, PG. 2141
On June 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Conference Committee Report 2228c; Adopted, VV; SJ 19
On June 24, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report 2228c: Adopted, VV; HJ 54, PG. 2105-2108
On June 16, 2015 in the House:
- Conference Committee Report #2015-2228c; House Amendment + New Amendment; Filed
On June 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/16/2015, 12:00 p.m., Room 102, LOB
On June 9, 2015 in the House:
- Speaker Appoints: Reps Abrami, Henle, Leeman, Manning (in recess of 6/3/2015); HJ 44, PG. 1953
- House Accedes to Senate Request for Committee of Conference (Rep Hinch): MA VV (in recess of 6/3/2015); HJ 44, PG. 1953
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- President Appoints: Senators Boutin, Daniels, and Feltes
- Sen. Boutin Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment #1279h; Requests C of C, MA, VV; SJ 17
On June 3, 2015 in the House:
- Amendment #1279h: AA VV; HJ 44, PG. 1833
- Ought to Pass with Amendment #1279h: MA VV; HJ 44, PG. 1833
On May 28, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1279h for Jun 3 (Vote 16-0; CC); HC 39, PG. 1632
On May 12, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 5/21/2015 10:00 AM LOB 202
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 4/23/2015 11:00 AM LOB 202
On April 2, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 4/9/2015 11:30 AM LOB 202==RECESSED==
On March 11, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 3/17/2015 11:00 AM LOB 202
On March 4, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; HJ 22, PG. 629
On February 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0224s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 5
- Committee Amendment 0224s, NT, AA, VV
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0224s, NT, 2/12/15; SC9
On January 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing:=== RESCHEDULED === 2/5/15, Room 103, SH, 9:00 a.m.; SC8
On January 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing:=== CANCELLED === 1/27/15, Room 103, SH, 9:00 a.m.; SC7
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor