+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2023; Chapter 0163; Effective 01/01/2024
On June 30, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 16
On June 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Ought to Pass: MA DV 192-173 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 62
On May 17, 2023 in the House:
- Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 05/16/2023 (Vote 11-9; RC)
- Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/16/2023 10:00 am LOB 201-203
On April 11, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/18/2023 10:00 am LOB 201-203
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Transportation
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On February 7, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9A
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Transportation; SJ 4
- Hearing: 01/24/2023, Room 101, LOB, 01:15 pm; SC 7
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor