+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV; HJ 34, PG. 1549
On April 9, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Apr 15 (Vote 18-2; CC); HC 29, PG. 1307
On April 1, 2015 in the House:
- Executive Session: 4/7/2015 10:00 AM LOB 304
On March 25, 2015 in the House:
- Continued Public Hearing: 3/31/2015 1:00 PM LOB 304
On March 18, 2015 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 3/24/2015 2:30 PM LOB 304 =RECESSED=
On March 12, 2015 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; HJ 26, PG. 1275
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0728s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; SJ 8
- Committee Amendment 0728s, AA, VV
On March 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0728s, 3/12/15; SC12
On February 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/11/15, Room 100, SH, 9:15 a.m.; SC9
On January 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; SJ 4