+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On August 9, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 09/19/2023 10:00 am LOB 202-204
On May 30, 2023 in the House:
- Retained in Committee
On May 23, 2023 in the House:
- ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/30/2023 11:00 am LOB 202-204
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Full Committee Work Session: 05/03/2023 09:30 am LOB 202-204
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/25/2023 10:00 am LOB 202-204
- ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/26/2023 01:30 pm LOB 202-204
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Ways and Means
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass: MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/22/2023; SC 11
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0139s, MA, VV; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0139s, AA, VV; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0139s, 02/09/2023; SC 9
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 4
- Hearing: 01/25/2023, Room 100, SH, 09:30 am; SC 7