+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 06/24/2013; Chapter 0109; Effective 08/23/2013
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled
On May 29, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled; HJ45, PG.1527
On May 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #2013-1680e, NT; Adopted (5/2/13)
On May 8, 2013 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill Amendment #1680e(NT) Adopted; HJ41, PG.1424
- Ought to Pass: MA VV; HJ41, PG.1390
On April 30, 2013 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 14-1; CC); HC36, PG.1198
On April 24, 2013 in the House:
- Executive Session: 4/30/2013 10:30 AM LOB 301
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 4/17/2013 1:00 PM LOB 301
On March 27, 2013 in the House:
- Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; HJ31, PG.1075
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 0893s, NT, MA, VV; OT3rdg;
- Committee Amendment 0893s, NT, AA, VV;
On March 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0893s, NT, 3/21/13; SC12
On February 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/13/13, Room 102, LOB, 9:30 a.m.; SC8
On January 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor