+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; SJ 10
- Sen. Bradley Moved Remove From Table, MA, VV; SJ 10
On March 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Sen. Sanborn Moved Laid on Table, MA, VV; SJ 8
- Rereferred to Committee Not Voted On; SJ 8
On March 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/12/15; SC12
On February 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 2/10/15, Room 101, LOB, 1:00 p.m.; SC9
On January 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; SJ 5