+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (15)
On May 4, 2023 in the House:
- Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Almy): MA VV 05/04/2023 HJ 13 P. 45
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 04/26/2023 (Vote 20-0; RC)
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/25/2023 10:30 am LOB 202-204
- Executive Session: 04/26/2023 01:30 pm LOB 202-204
On April 7, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 04/06/2023 and referred to Ways and Means
On March 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-1145s, AA, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1145s, RC 11Y-12N, MF; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Sen. Avard Moved Reconsideration on the vote on Ought to Pass as Amended, MA, VV; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1145s, RC 12Y-11N, MA; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; SJ 12
On March 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1145s, 03/30/2023; SC 15
On February 22, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0438s, AA, VV; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0438s, RC 13Y-11N, MA; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/22/2023; SJ 8
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0438s, 02/22/2023; SC 11
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 4
- Hearing: 01/25/2023, Room 100, SH, 10:30 am; SC 7
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (2)
March 30, 2023: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 1
March 30, 2023: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 23
- Absent: 1