+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (15)
On August 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 07/28/2023; Chapter 0160; Effective 07/28/2023
On June 30, 2023 in the House:
- Enrolled (in recess of) 06/29/2023 HJ 17 P. 16
On June 30, 2023 in the Senate:
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 06/29/2023); SJ 20
On June 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Pearl Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 06/01/2023; SJ 16
On May 18, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-1569h: AA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 9
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-1569h: MA VV 05/18/2023 HJ 14 P. 9
On May 9, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-1569h (Vote 12-0; CC)
- Executive Session: 04/28/2023 10:30 am LOB 206-208
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/28/2023 10:30 am LOB 206-208
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs
On February 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0303s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0303s, AA, VV; 02/09/2023; SJ 6
On February 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0303s, 02/09/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 9A
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/01/2023, Room 103, SH, 09:15 am; SC 8
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; SJ 4
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor