+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 8, 2023 in the House:
- Inexpedient to Legislate: MA VV 06/08/2023 HJ 15 P. 4
On May 25, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 05/10/2023 (Vote 18-0; CC)
On May 3, 2023 in the House:
- Executive Session: 05/10/2023 10:00 am LOB 302-304
On April 27, 2023 in the House:
- Subcommittee Work Session: 05/03/2023 10:10 am LOB 302-304
On April 5, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 04/12/2023 02:15 pm LOB 302-304
On March 20, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 03/16/2023 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0127s, AA, VV; 01/26/2023; SJ 5
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0127s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/26/2023; SJ 5
On January 25, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0127s, 01/26/2023; Vote 5-0; CC; SC 7A
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/05/2023 and Referred to Commerce; SJ 4
- Hearing: 01/24/2023, Room 100, SH, 09:45 am; SC 7
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor