+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (4)
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Inexpedient to Legislate, RC 12Y-11N, MA === BILL KILLED ===; 02/23/2017; SJ 7
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/23/2017; SC 11
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/31/2017, Room 103, SH, 02:00 pm; SC 8
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Finance; SJ 5
+ − Vote
February 23, 2017: Inexpedient to Legislate
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 11
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor