+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 19, 2023 in the House:
- Introduced (in recess of) 01/05/2023 and referred to Finance HJ 3 P. 25
On February 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed by the Governor on 02/14/2023; Chapter 0001
- I. Section 1 Effective 02/28/2023
- II. Section 6 Effective 11/01/2024
- III. Remainder Effective 02/14/2023
On February 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- Sen. Carson Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, MA, VV; 02/14/2023; SJ 7
- Enrolled Adopted, VV, (In recess 02/14/2023); SJ 8
On February 14, 2023 in the House:
- Amendment # 2023-0465h: AA VV 02/14/2023 HJ 5
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0465h: MA VV 02/14/2023 HJ 5
- Rules Suspension to allow for immediate third reading MA obtaining necessary 2/3 MA VV 02/14/2023 HJ 5 P. 14
- Adopted and read a 3rd time MA VV 02/14/2023 HJ 5 P. 14
- Enrolled 02/14/2023 HJ 5
On February 9, 2023 in the House:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0465h (NT) 02/09/2023 (Vote 23-0; RC) HC 11
On February 2, 2023 in the House:
- Public Hearing: 02/09/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211
- Executive Session: 02/09/2023 01:30 pm LOB 210-211
- Division Work Session: 02/09/2023 11:30 am LOB 210-211
On January 27, 2023 in the House:
- ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 02/08/2023 10:00 am LOB 210-211
- ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 02/08/2023 10:45 am LOB 210-211
On January 26, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0124s, AA, VV; 01/26/2023; SJ 5
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0124s, MA, VV; OT3rdg; 01/26/2023; SJ 5
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0124s, 01/26/2023; SC 7A
On January 19, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Amendment # 2023-0055s, AA, VV; 01/19/2023; SJ 4
- Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0055s, RC 22Y-2N, MA; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/19/2023; SJ 4
On January 17, 2023 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0055s, 01/19/2023; SC 6A
On January 5, 2023 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 01/12/2023, Room 100, SH, 10:00 am; SC 5
On January 4, 2023 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/04/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; SJ 3
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Vote
January 19, 2023: Ought to Pass w/Amendment
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 24
Details:
+
−
- Jeb Bradley: Yea
- David Watters: Yea
- Sharon Carson: Yea
- Donna Soucy: Yea
- Lou D'Allesandro: Yea
- Regina Birdsell: Nay
- Shannon Chandley: Yea
- James Gray: Yea
- Keith Murphy: Yea
- Cindy Rosenwald: Yea
- Kevin Avard: Yea
- Ruth Ward: Yea
- Daniel Innis: Yea
- Debra Altschiller: Yea
- Donovan Fenton: Yea
- Timothy Lang: Yea
- Howard Pearl: Yea
- Daryl Abbas: Nay
- Suzanne Prentiss: Yea
- Rebecca Whitley: Yea
- Bill Gannon: Yea
- Rebecca Perkins Kwoka: Yea
- Denise Ricciardi: Yea
- Carrie Gendreau: Yea