+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Refer to Interim Study, MA, VV; 01/03/2018; SJ 1
On December 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/03/2018; SC 48
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Committee, MA, VV; 03/16/2017; SJ 9
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/16/2017; SC 14
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Hearing: 02/22/2017, Room 100, SH, 09:35 am; SC 11
On February 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced 01/19/2017 and Referred to Ways and Means; SJ 5
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor